+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 530) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:30PM in conference room 224.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA/WTL, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.