+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 535).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1435-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1074-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2933) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2067) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN .
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor