+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-16-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3089) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-11-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 10:01AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor