+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 943-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Woodson.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-11-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 126) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2557) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS/EDU, WAM.
- Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, CPN.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.