+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 38
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 122) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2646) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-25-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPN/JDL, WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN/JDL.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.