+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 71-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 71-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tsuji, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 1:05PM in conference room 224.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:05PM in conference room 224.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:05PM in conference room 224.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
- Re-referred to WAL, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Ruderman, Slom.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 521).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1630-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Kong, Luke, Rhoads, Say, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 03-17-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2772) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2073) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor