+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 159) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3352) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211.
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WAM/JDC.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.