+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-27-17 at 2:05PM in Conference Room 225.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 225.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:15AM in conference room 225.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; L. Thielen, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Quinlan Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515).
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1725), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Gates; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-22-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 101) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Kim, Taniguchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Green, Riviere, Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:40PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-17 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.