+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 1:05PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 1:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; English Co-Chair; K. Rhoads.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: LoPresti, Fukumoto Co-Chairs; Cachola, Cullen, Ward.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1896-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:35PM in conference room 308.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 10:20AM in House conference room 429.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2831) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 9:45AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor