+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Solomon, Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 8:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor