+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Harimoto, Moriwaki, Fevella.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Quinlan, Matsumoto.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 645).
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 04-05-19.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2065), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, McDermott.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 11:30AM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 11:30am.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 70) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1101) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.