+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 8:45AM; CR 325.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Todd, Matsumoto.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred One Day 04-13-21.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Marten, McKelvey, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger voting no (8) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1709), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Tam; 3 Noes: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (5) and none excused (0).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 169) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 731) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, JDC.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor