+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TEC/GVO, WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.