+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1238-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-22-16 3:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-22-16 at 3:00 PM in room 325.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2594) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor