+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, JDC.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor