+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1094-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to GVR, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2775) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 51) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, JDC.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor