+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act 045, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- Act 045, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1145).
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, LoPresti, McKelvey, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 79-22).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 79-22) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Rhoads, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Todd, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Todd Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Matsumoto.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Chang, Fevella.
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866).
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 528).
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1868-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Branco, Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2833) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Lee.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDC.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor