+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2447) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-16-16 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 8:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor