+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 028, 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Act 028, on 04/28/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1128).
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1612-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Thielen.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 04-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-02-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-16 2:00PM.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-29-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 21
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 24).
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-22-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDL/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2388) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Galuteria, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 02-17-16 1:20PM in conference room 414.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on EET deferred the measure.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-10-16 1:35PM in conference room 414.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL/EET.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor