+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Fevella.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-13-20 10:55AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor