+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 102).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2694) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 11:15AM in conference room 016.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-14 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC, JDL.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor