+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-29-16 1:25PM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-23-16 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-17-16 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.