+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 9:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to WLH, LMG, JUD, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 111) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2964) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Gabbard.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.