+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 202, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Act 202, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 33-18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 33-18).
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Luke, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 2:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 802).
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, McDermott.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1904-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1328-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-18 9:45AM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor