+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2018) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.