+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:30PM in conference room 423.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
- House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Takayama Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Ward Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Kidani, Solomon, Slom Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1056-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Wooley.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 98) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2254) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to EGH, WAM.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.