+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
- The committee(s) on WAM reconsidered its previous decision. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision on 02-19-20 and will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:45PM in conference room 211.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2684) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-04-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.