+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:20PM in conference room 016.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.