+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor