+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to WLH/HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 91) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3153) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2350) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, JDC.
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor