+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
On July 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07/12/2022 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 67-22) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 67-22).
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Johanson, Nakashima, Tam, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 4:00PM; Conference Room 329.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Tam, Ward.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker, Acasio Co-Chairs; Moriwaki, Fevella.
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880).
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 595).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1926-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1434-22), recommending referral to JHA.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Mizuno.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2983) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2065) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN/JDC.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor