+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1143), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 27).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.