+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor