+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, McDermott.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 83) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2515) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2064) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor