+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:35PM in conference room 225.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE, WAM.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/AEN/CPH, WAM.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and passed First Reading.
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending Introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor