+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 14) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH/WAM.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-23-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
- Referred to HMS, CPH.
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.