+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Wakai, Fevella.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 721).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-19 at 2:00PM.
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 30).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 03-05-19.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-01-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 770) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor