+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator(s) Ige discharged as Co-Chair(s).
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Chun Oakland, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, L. Thielen, Slom.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 509).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1532) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1051), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 90) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 697) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-13 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/HMS, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor