+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ward.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-23-15 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 81) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEA, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.