+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor