+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-15 1:15PM in conference room 414.
- The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 3:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to ENE/HTH, WAM.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor