+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Thielen.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454).
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1375) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Har, Tupola; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-21-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-22-17 9:15AM in conference room 016.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH, JDL.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.