+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to LGO, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Fukunaga, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 56) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-03-23.
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from PSM/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 332) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
- The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 4:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/LBT, WAM.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor