+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1389) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 483) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC, WAM.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor