+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 5, 2023 in the House:
- Act 222, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
On July 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Act 222, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
On May 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting no (2) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996).
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901).
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 177).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23.
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 177) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23.
On April 28, 2023 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Sayama, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 5:01PM; Conference Room 224.
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864).
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329.
On April 24, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Sayama, Kila Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; DeCoite Co-Chair; Keohokalole.
On April 18, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904).
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 718).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882).
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-23.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1955) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward; and Excused: none.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 24, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1543) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tam.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1).
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 10, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 03-14-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 482) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to TCA, WAM.
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor