+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 93) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-01-17 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor