+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
- The committee on EET deferred the measure.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor