+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
On April 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 1:35PM; Conference Room 325.
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840).
On April 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Takayama, Souza.
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Rhoads, Kim Co-Chairs; Fevella.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 932).
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888).
On April 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 789).
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2106) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23.
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 31, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Lowen excused (3).
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Kong.
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-15-23 2:15PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On March 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 462) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- One Day Notice 03-07-23.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 341) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBT, JDC/WAM.
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
- Passed First Reading.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor