+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 324) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor