+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 080, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Act 080, on 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Nishihara.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-27-15.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-15.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:02PM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642).
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, Thielen.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Shimabukuro, Slom.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 486).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 596) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor